Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Candidates for Offices of Municipalities and Common Ownership Communities - Reports of Donations and Disbursements
Sponsored by
Delegate Terrasa
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain municipalities, cooperative housing corporations, condominiums, and homeowners associations that require candidates for office to file reports of donations and disbursements to transmit copies of the reports to the State Board of Elections; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/01/2021
Legislative Date
11/01/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/06/2022
Legislative Date
1/06/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/01/2021 11/01/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Candidates for Offices of Municipalities and Common Ownership Communities - Reports of Donations and Disbursements
House 1/06/2022 1/06/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
(   13-106 )
(   11-109.5, 11B-106.3 )
Last Updated: 1/27/2022 12:41 PM
Click to return on the top page