Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Returned Peace Corps Volunteers - In-State Tuition
Sponsored by
Delegate Hill
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting returned Peace Corps volunteers who are domiciled in the State from paying nonresident tuition at a public institution of higher education in the State; establishing that returned Peace Corps volunteer students shall be included as in-State residents for the computation of State aid to community colleges; and requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to adopt regulations.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0050
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/27/2021
Legislative Date
9/27/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Higher Education - Returned Peace Corps Volunteers - In-State Tuition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2022
Legislative Date
1/05/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Higher Education - Returned Peace Corps Volunteers - In-State Tuition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-4)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/20/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2022
Legislative Date
4/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/27/2021 9/27/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Higher Education - Returned Peace Corps Volunteers - In-State Tuition
House 1/05/2022 1/05/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Higher Education - Returned Peace Corps Volunteers - In-State Tuition
House 2/24/2022 2/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (129-4) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2022 2/20/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 4/01/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 3/27/2022 Returned Passed 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/12/2022 4/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76
Text - Chapter - Higher Education - Returned Peace Corps Volunteers - In-State Tuition
(   15-106.11 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:07 PM
Click to return on the top page