Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Home- and Community-Based Services Waiver - Participation and Applications
Sponsored by
Delegates Cullison, Pendergrass, Pena-Melnyk, Bagnall, Belcastro, Bhandari, Carr, Chisholm, Hill, Johnson, Kaiser, Kelly, Kerr, Kipke, Krebs, Landis, R. Lewis, Morgan, Reilly, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the required contents of the home- and community-based services waiver submitted by the Maryland Department of Health to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services; requiring the Department, if the Department maintains a waiting list for the waiver, to send a waiver application each month all individuals on the waiting list if there are fewer than 600, and to at least 600 if there are more than 600 on the waiting list; and requiring the Department to apply for an amendment to the home-and community-based services waiver.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0028
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/29/2021
Legislative Date
10/29/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2022
Legislative Date
1/11/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2022
Legislative Date
1/28/2022
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {673129/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/29/2021 10/29/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Home- and Community-Based Services Waiver - Participation and Applications
House 1/11/2022 1/11/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 2:30 p.m.
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 Hearing canceled
House 1/28/2022 1/28/2022 Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable with Amendments {673129/1 Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Home- and Community-Based Services Waiver - Participation and Applications
House 4/08/2022 3/31/2022 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Referred Rules 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/27/2022 4:13 PM
Click to return on the top page