Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Highways – Designated Shoulder Areas – Establishment and Use by Transit Buses
Sponsored by
Delegates Krimm and Korman
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Highway Administration, in consultation with the Maryland Transit Administration and the Department of State Police, to designate shoulder areas on State highways that may be used for travel, subject to day and time restrictions, by transit buses; and requiring the State Highway Administration to post certain signage to indicate the beginning and end of a designated shoulder area.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/04/2021
Legislative Date
10/04/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/04/2021 10/04/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - State Highways – Designated Shoulder Areas – Establishment and Use by Transit Buses
House 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:07 PM
Click to return on the top page