Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums (Long-Term Care Relief Act of 2022)
Sponsored by
Delegate Stewart
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering eligibility for and the maximum amount of a credit against the State income tax for certain long-term care insurance premiums paid by a taxpayer with a Maryland adjusted gross income of less than $250,000 for long-term care insurance purchased before January 1, 2005; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2021.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0058
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/19/2021
Legislative Date
10/19/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2022
Legislative Date
1/07/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/19/2021 10/19/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums (Long-Term Care Relief Act of 2022)
House 1/07/2022 1/07/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:07 PM
Click to return on the top page