Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment – Leave With Pay – Bereavement Leave
Sponsored by
Delegate Boyce
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 573
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing employees of certain employers to use certain leave with pay for bereavement leave; defining the term "bereavement leave" as leave an employee is allowed to use on the death of a member of the employee's immediate family; and defining the term "child" for purposes of certain bereavement leave to include an adopted, biological, or foster child, a stepchild, or a legal ward.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0473
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
6/19/2020
Legislative Date
6/19/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Labor and Employment – Leave With Pay – Bereavement Leave
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Labor and Employment – Leave With Pay – Bereavement Leave
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-37)
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 573
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Labor and Employment – Leave With Pay – Bereavement Leave
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 6/19/2020 6/19/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Labor and Employment – Leave With Pay – Bereavement Leave
House 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/17/2021 2/17/2021 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Labor and Employment – Leave With Pay – Bereavement Leave
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (95-37) 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2021 2/15/2021 Referred Finance 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2021 3/26/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/26/2021 3/06/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/14/2021 Returned Passed 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 573
Text - Chapter - Labor and Employment – Leave With Pay – Bereavement Leave
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:06 PM
Click to return on the top page