Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Nurse Anesthetists - Drug Authority
Sponsored by
Delegate Cullison
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 686
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a nurse anesthetist to prescribe, order, and administer drugs, including controlled dangerous substances; and providing that a nurse anesthetist may prescribe drugs only in an amount that does not exceed a 10-day supply, only to an individual with whom the nurse anesthetist has, at the time of prescription, established a client or patient record, and only in connection with the delivery of anesthesia services.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1011
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/29/2021
Legislative Date
10/29/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2022
Legislative Date
1/25/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2022
Legislative Date
1/25/2022
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {483022/1 Adopted
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health Occupations - Nurse Anesthetists - Drug Authority
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-6)
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
4/06/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted (29-14)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-14)
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 686
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Health Occupations - Nurse Anesthetists - Drug Authority
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/29/2021 10/29/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Occupations - Nurse Anesthetists - Drug Authority and Collaboration
House 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
House 1/25/2022 1/25/2022 Hearing canceled
House 1/25/2022 1/25/2022 Hearing 2/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Favorable with Amendments {483022/1 Adopted 13 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Occupations - Nurse Anesthetists - Drug Authority
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 Third Reading Passed (126-6) 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2022 2/15/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 4/06/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Favorable Adopted (29-14) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Second Reading Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Third Reading Passed (32-14) 66AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Returned Passed 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 686
Text - Chapter - Health Occupations - Nurse Anesthetists - Drug Authority
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:07 PM
Click to return on the top page