Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax - Transfer to Heir or Legatee - Payment Plans
Sponsored by
Delegates Atterbeary and Hill
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting a grant of land transferring residential real property from the estate of a decedent to an heir or a legatee of the decedent from certain requirements for the payment of taxes on real property if the heir or legatee of the decedent enters into a payment plan to pay all the taxes due and owed on the property; exempting a grant of land that is subject to a payment plan for property taxes from certain requirements for the payment of taxes if the grantee agrees to assume the grantor's obligations under the payment plan; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/07/2023
Legislative Date
9/07/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Property Tax - Transfer to Heir - Payment Plans
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2024
Legislative Date
1/17/2024
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2024
Legislative Date
2/24/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {733523/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2024
Legislative Date
2/24/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Property Tax - Transfer to Heir or Legatee - Payment Plans
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
2/21/2024
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {733023/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Property Tax - Transfer to Heir or Legatee - Payment Plans
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/07/2023 9/07/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Property Tax - Transfer to Heir - Payment Plans
House 1/17/2024 1/17/2024 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2024 2/27/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/28/2024 2/24/2024 Favorable with Amendments {733523/1 Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2024 2/24/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Property Tax - Transfer to Heir or Legatee - Payment Plans
House 3/01/2024 2/26/2024 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2024 2/21/2024 Referred Budget and Taxation 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2024 3/21/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2024 3/29/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable with Amendments {733023/1 Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2024 3/14/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2024 3/16/2024 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2024 3/19/2024 House Concurs Senate Amendments 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2024 3/19/2024 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2024 3/19/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Property Tax - Transfer to Heir or Legatee - Payment Plans
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 1:26 PM
Click to return on the top page