Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education – St. Mary’s College of Maryland – Cost–of–Living Adjustment
Sponsored by
Delegate Crosby
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the percentage of the cost-of-living adjustment provided to State-supported employees of St. Mary's College of Maryland from 50% to 100% for the fiscal years in which the State provides a cost-of-living adjustment for State employees.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0332
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1331 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/10/2021
Legislative Date
9/10/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2022
Legislative Date
1/05/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-37)
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/10/2021 9/10/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Higher Education – St. Mary’s College of Maryland – Cost–of–Living Adjustment
House 1/05/2022 1/05/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 Hearing canceled
House 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2022 2/28/2022 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/01/2022 2/25/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 18AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Higher Education – St. Mary’s College of Maryland – Cost–of–Living Adjustment
House 3/03/2022 2/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (96-37) 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2022 2/24/2022 Referred Budget and Taxation 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2022 3/16/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/25/2022 Returned Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/7/2022 1:49 PM
Click to return on the top page