Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Dedicated Bus Lanes - Prohibition and Monitoring Systems
Sponsored by
Delegates R. Lewis, Amprey, Boyce, Lierman, and Prettyman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 468
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from driving a motor vehicle in a dedicated bus lane unless authorized by a local jurisdiction, subject to certain exceptions; requiring the City of Baltimore to issue a new competitive request for proposals to select a certain contractor to carry out certain provisions of the Act; requiring the Baltimore City Police Department to issue a warning notice in place of a citation to a liable owner during the first 45 days that the bus lane monitoring system is in operation; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0284 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/14/2021
Legislative Date
10/14/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {273023/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-33)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/20/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {563521/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {733521/1 (Senator West) Adopted
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (37-10)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-33)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2022
Legislative Date
5/16/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 468
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/14/2021 10/14/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Dedicated Bus Lanes - Prohibition and Monitoring Systems
House 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Favorable with Amendments {273023/1 Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Dedicated Bus Lanes - Prohibition and Monitoring Systems
House 2/24/2022 2/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (102-33) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2022 2/20/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable with Amendments {563521/1 Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/28/2022 Floor Amendment {733521/1 (Senator West) Adopted 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/28/2022 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (37-10) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (94-33) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Vehicle Laws - Dedicated Bus Lanes - Prohibition and Monitoring Systems
Post Passage 5/16/2022 5/16/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 468
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws - Dedicated Bus Lanes - Prohibition and Monitoring Systems
(   21-101,   21-1133, 21-1134 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:07 PM
Click to return on the top page