Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools – Expanded American History – Development of Content Standards and Implementation
Sponsored by
Delegate Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education to, by December 1, 2022, develop content standards for expanded American history; requiring each county board of education, in collaboration with the local school system, to develop and implement certain curriculum guides for expanded American history; requiring each public school, by the 2023-2024 school year, to include expanded American history in the social studies curriculum; and requiring the State Department of Education and the State Board to jointly analyze certain content standards.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0462
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/08/2021
Legislative Date
10/08/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2022
Legislative Date
1/05/2022
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/08/2021 10/08/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Public Schools – Expanded American History – Development of Content Standards and Implementation
House 1/05/2022 1/05/2022 Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
(   7-205.5 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:06 PM
Click to return on the top page