Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Emergency Service Transporters – Reimbursement
Sponsored by
Delegates Hornberger, Reilly, Pendergrass, Bagnall, Belcastro, Bhandari, Carr, Chisholm, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kaiser, Kelly, Kerr, Kipke, Krebs, Landis, R. Lewis, Morgan, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the medical services provided by an emergency service transporter for which the Maryland Department of Health is required to reimburse the emergency service transporter that charges for its services and requests reimbursement from the Maryland Medical Assistance Program; and requiring the Department to increase the amount of reimbursement by $50 in fiscal year 2023 and pay at least that amount in each subsequent fiscal year.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0295
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0552 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/25/2021
Legislative Date
10/25/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2022
Legislative Date
1/11/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 2:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 2:50 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {923026/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/25/2021 10/25/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Emergency Service Transporters – Reimbursement
House 1/11/2022 1/11/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 2:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 2:50 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Favorable with Amendments {923026/1 Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Emergency Service Transporters – Reimbursement
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 Referred Rules 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:06 PM
Click to return on the top page