Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of General Services – Energy–Conserving Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2022)
Sponsored by
Delegate Hill
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of General Services to establish and periodically update standards for State buildings to conserve energy and minimize adverse impacts on birds; requiring the Maryland Green Building Council to include the standards in any requirements that the Council establishes for participation in a higher-performance building program in the State; and defining "State building".
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0236 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/27/2021
Legislative Date
9/27/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 2:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-33)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/20/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/27/2021 9/27/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Text - First - Department of General Services – Energy–Conserving Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2022)
House 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 2:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of General Services – Energy–Conserving Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2022)
House 2/24/2022 2/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (101-33) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2022 2/20/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:06 PM
Click to return on the top page