Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Voting Systems Costs, Polling Places, and Primary Election Date - Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Palakovich Carr
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Codifying a requirement that a county pay its share of 50% of the State's costs to acquire and operate the uniform statewide voting systems for voting in polling places and for absentee voting; requiring that a county's share of the cost be based on the county's voting age population; requiring that in certain statewide elections in-person voting on election day be conducted at a certain number of precinct polling places; prohibiting a court from postponing the date of the 2022 primary election to any date after July 12, 2022; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0158
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/21/2021
Legislative Date
10/21/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Board of Elections - Contracts and Invoices - Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/06/2022
Legislative Date
1/06/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {743425/1 Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {993423/1 (Delegate Wilkins) Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-11)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/21/2021 10/21/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - State Board of Elections - Contracts and Invoices - Requirements
House 1/06/2022 1/06/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 Hearing canceled
House 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Favorable with Amendments {743425/1 Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Floor Amendment {993423/1 (Delegate Wilkins) Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Election Law - Voting Systems Costs, Polling Places, and Primary Election Date - Requirements
House 3/10/2022 3/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (125-11) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2022 3/01/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:06 PM
Click to return on the top page