Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Surcharges and Payment to Special Funds - Prohibited Lease Provisions
Sponsored by
Delegate Clippinger
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (29-16)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing certain surcharges on certain fees, charges, and costs in certain civil cases in the circuit courts and the District Court; requiring that certain surcharges collected be deposited into the Maryland Legal Services Corporation Fund and directed to certain special funds in the State; establishing the Rental Assistance Special Fund to provide funding to nonprofit organizations that work in the area of rent assistance to pay the back rent for individuals facing a potential residential rental property eviction; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Courts - Surcharges and Payment to Rental Assistance Programs
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {762710/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (80-48)
Proceedings
26AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {638676/1
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator West) Rejected (20-27)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Motion Limit Debate (Senator King) Adopted (32-15)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Question is on the Appeal from a decision of the Chair Rejected (31-15)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {638676/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {103829/1 (Senator West) Rejected
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (29-16)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Courts - Surcharges and Payment to Rental Assistance Programs
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Favorable with Amendments {762710/1 Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Courts - Surcharges and Payment to Special Funds - Prohibited Lease Provisions
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Third Reading Passed (80-48) 26AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/19/2021 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Favorable with Amendments {638676/1 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator West) Rejected (20-27) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Committee Amendment Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Motion Limit Debate (Senator King) Adopted (32-15) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Question is on the Appeal from a decision of the Chair Rejected (31-15) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Favorable with Amendments {638676/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Floor Amendment {103829/1 (Senator West) Rejected 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/22/2021 Third Reading Passed (29-16) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 11:32 AM
Click to return on the top page