Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Office of People's Counsel - Alterations (Office of People's Counsel Environmental Reform Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Korman
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 607
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the maximum amount that may be charged to a public service company for a State fiscal year; requiring the Office of the People's Counsel to hire at least one assistant people's counsel to focus on environmental issues; authorizing the Office to retain or hire experts in the field of climate change; requiring the Office to consider the public safety, economic welfare, and environmental interests of the State and its residents in determining whether a matter affects the interests of residential and noncommercial users; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/28/2020
Legislative Date
9/28/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {723190/1 Adopted
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-38)
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {757371/1
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {757371/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-42)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 607
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/28/2020 9/28/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Public Utilities – Office of Climate Counsel – Establishment (Climate Counsel Act)
House 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2021 3/03/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/04/2021 2/28/2021 Favorable with Amendments {723190/1 Adopted 19 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2021 2/28/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Office of People's Counsel - Alterations (Office of People's Counsel Environmental Reform Act)
House 3/05/2021 3/01/2021 Third Reading Passed (94-38) 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2021 2/22/2021 Referred Finance 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2021 3/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/26/2021 3/06/2021 Favorable with Amendments {757371/1 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2021 3/06/2021 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Favorable with Amendments {757371/1 Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2021 3/08/2021 Third Reading Passed (33-14) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (96-42) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Office of People's Counsel - Alterations (Office of People's Counsel Environmental Reform Act)
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 607
Text - Chapter - Office of People's Counsel - Alterations (Office of People's Counsel Environmental Reform Act)
(   2011, 2013, 2015, 2019 )
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:22 PM
Click to return on the top page