Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Penalties for Failure to Pay Video Toll and Electronic Tolling Performance Audit
Sponsored by
Delegates Carr, Amprey, Barve, Boyce, Foley, Fraser-Hidalgo, Healey, Holmes, Jalisi, Lehman, Lierman, Love, Prettyman, Ruth, Stein, Stewart, Terrasa, Wells, and Wivell
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that the Motor Vehicle Administration, under certain circumstances, suspend the registration of a motor vehicle that incurs a certain toll violation; altering the authority of the Maryland Transportation Authority to enter certain reciprocal agreements for the enforcement of violations; and requiring the Maryland Transportation Authority to competitively bid for a certified public accounting firm to conduct a performance audit of the electronic tolling operations of the Authority.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0105
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0346 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/08/2021
Legislative Date
10/08/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws – Failure to Pay Video Toll – Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {663327/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/08/2021 10/08/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws – Failure to Pay Video Toll – Penalties
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments {663327/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Penalties for Failure to Pay Video Toll and Electronic Tolling Performance Audit
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:06 PM
Click to return on the top page