Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pharmacists - Nicotine Replacement Therapy Medication
Sponsored by
Delegates Bhandari and R. Lewis
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 319
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a pharmacist who meets the requirements of regulations adopted by the State Board of Pharmacy to prescribe and dispense nicotine replacement therapy medications approved by the U.S. Food and Drug Administration for the purpose of aiding in tobacco cessation or smoking cessation.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0062
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1594 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/29/2021
Legislative Date
10/29/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Pharmacists - Aids for the Cessation of Tobacco Product Use
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 4:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 4:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {843820/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Pharmacists - Nicotine Replacement Therapy Medication
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Finance
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {363122/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Pharmacists - Nicotine Replacement Therapy Medication
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2022
Legislative Date
5/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 319
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Pharmacists - Nicotine Replacement Therapy Medication
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/29/2021 10/29/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Pharmacists - Aids for the Cessation of Tobacco Product Use
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 Hearing 1/20 at 2:30 p.m.
House 1/20/2022 1/19/2022 Hearing canceled
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 Hearing 1/20 at 4:00 p.m.
House 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 Hearing canceled
House 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 Hearing 1/20 at 4:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Favorable with Amendments {843820/1 Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Pharmacists - Nicotine Replacement Therapy Medication
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/09/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Finance 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Favorable with Amendments {363122/1 Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Pharmacists - Nicotine Replacement Therapy Medication
Post Passage 5/12/2022 5/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 319
Text - Chapter - Pharmacists - Nicotine Replacement Therapy Medication
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:06 PM
Click to return on the top page