Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
No–Knock Warrants
Sponsored by
Delegate Acevero
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Racial Equity Impact Note
Synopsis
Repealing the authority for the issuance and execution of a no-knock search warrant; establishing that a warrant may not authorize an officer to enter a building, apartment, premises or place without first announcing the officer's purpose and authority; specifying that a warrant may be executed only between 8:00 a.m. and 7:00 p.m.; and requiring an officer executing a search warrant, prior to entering certain areas to be searched, to give reasonable notice to alert any occupants within the officer's authority and purpose.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0038 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/14/2023
Legislative Date
8/14/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - No–Knock Warrants
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2024
Legislative Date
2/10/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Racial Equity Impact Note
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/14/2023 8/14/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - No–Knock Warrants
House 2/10/2024 2/10/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - Racial Equity Impact Note
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 12:44 PM
Click to return on the top page