Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Residential Real Estate Transactions – Escrow Agents and Trust Money
Sponsored by
Delegate Holmes
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definitions of "escrow agent" and "trust money" for purposes of a requirement that an escrow agent enter into a certain agreement with the seller and the buyer of residential real estate when the escrow agent agrees to hold trust money; defining "residential real estate" as real property improved by four or fewer single-family dwellings intended for human habitation and unimproved real property zoned for residential use; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/02/2020
Legislative Date
10/02/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Residential Real Estate Transactions – Escrow Agents and Trust Money
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
10AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Residential Real Estate Transactions – Escrow Agents and Trust Money
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/02/2020 10/02/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Residential Real Estate Transactions – Escrow Agents and Trust Money
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 10AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Residential Real Estate Transactions – Escrow Agents and Trust Money
House 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2021 2/12/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2021 3/04/2021 Hearing 3/17 at 12:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/12/2021 3/22/2021 Favorable 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/22/2021 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/22/2021 Favorable Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/22/2021 Second Reading Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/30/2021 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/21/2021 1:32 PM
Click to return on the top page