Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Police Discipline - Order to Show Cause
Sponsored by
Delegate Cardin
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a police officer who is denied a certain right to apply to the circuit court at a certain time for an order that directs the law enforcement agency to show cause why the right should not be granted.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0663 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/16/2023
Legislative Date
10/16/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Police Discipline - Order to Show Cause
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2024
Legislative Date
2/10/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/16/2023 10/16/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Police Discipline - Order to Show Cause
House 2/10/2024 2/10/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
(   3-113.1 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 12:43 PM
Click to return on the top page