Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Equitable and Inclusive Transit-Oriented Development Enhancement Act
Sponsored by
Delegate J. Lewis
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:15 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the authority of the Secretary of Transportation to designate transit-oriented development; establishing the Transit-Oriented Development Capital Grant and Revolving Loan Fund to promote the equitable and inclusive development of transit-oriented developments; authorizing the Department of Transportation to use the Fund to provide financial assistance to local jurisdictions; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an amount sufficient to ensure a Fund balance of at least $5,000,000; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0151
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0710 Session: 2022 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2023
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/09/2022
Legislative Date
9/09/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Equitable and Inclusive Transit-Oriented Development Enhancement Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2023
Legislative Date
1/19/2023
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/17/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/09/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {163426/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/09/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Equitable and Inclusive Transit-Oriented Development Enhancement Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2023
Legislative Date
3/11/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-36)
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/11/2023
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2023
Legislative Date
3/23/2023
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/09/2022 9/09/2022 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means
Text - First - Equitable and Inclusive Transit-Oriented Development Enhancement Act
House 1/19/2023 1/19/2023 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2023 3/17/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2023 3/09/2023 Favorable with Amendments {163426/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2023 3/09/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Equitable and Inclusive Transit-Oriented Development Enhancement Act
House 3/18/2023 3/11/2023 Third Reading Passed (99-36) 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2023 3/11/2023 Referred Budget and Taxation 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2023 3/23/2023 Hearing 3/28 at 1:15 p.m.
(   7-101,   7-102,   7-103, 7-1201 through 7-1205 )
Last Updated: 3/28/2023 4:11 PM
Click to return on the top page