Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - African American History - Development of Content Standards and Implementation
Sponsored by
Delegate Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education, by December 1, 2021, to develop content standards for African American history to be included in certain State standards for social studies; requiring the content standards to include certain topics; requiring each county board of education to develop and implement certain age-appropriate curriculum guides for African American history subject to certain content standards; requiring each public school in the State, by the 2022-2023 school year, to implement an African American history curriculum; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/01/2020
Legislative Date
11/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/01/2020 11/01/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Public Schools - African American History - Development of Content Standards and Implementation
Age
(   7-205.5 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:21 PM
Click to return on the top page