Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Veterans of the Afghanistan and Iraq Conflicts Scholarship - Eligibility for Stepchildren
Sponsored by
Delegate Pippy
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the eligibility requirements for the Veterans of the Afghanistan and Iraq Conflicts Scholarship to include stepchildren of veterans, active duty and reserve members of the United States armed forces, and members of the Maryland National Guard who served in, or were activated as a result of, the Afghanistan or Iraq conflict.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/05/2021
Legislative Date
10/05/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2022
Legislative Date
1/05/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/05/2021 10/05/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Veterans of the Afghanistan and Iraq Conflicts Scholarship - Eligibility for Stepchildren
House 1/05/2022 1/05/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/26/2022 12:25 PM
Click to return on the top page