Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cemeteries - Perpetual Care - Distribution From Perpetual Care Trust Fund
Sponsored by
Delegate Krebs
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a distribution from a perpetual care trust fund to be used only for the perpetual care of the cemetery; requiring the cemetery to submit a statement to the Director of the Office of Cemetery Oversight if the cemetery selects a certain method of distribution from the trust fund; requiring the Office to report to certain committees of the General Assembly by December 1, 2027, the number of cemeteries selecting alternative distribution methods, the investment performance of the trust funds, and any legislative recommendations; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0192
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0243 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/06/2020
Legislative Date
8/06/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {746685/1 Adopted
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/06/2020 8/06/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Cemeteries - Perpetual Care - Distribution From Perpetual Care Trust Fund
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2021 3/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Favorable with Amendments {746685/1 Adopted 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Cemeteries - Perpetual Care - Distribution From Perpetual Care Trust Fund
House 3/12/2021 3/04/2021 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2021 2/25/2021 Referred Finance 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2021 3/26/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/26/2021 3/06/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/14/2021 Returned Passed 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
Text - Chapter - Cemeteries - Perpetual Care - Distribution From Perpetual Care Trust Fund
Last Updated: 5/20/2021 5:32 PM
Click to return on the top page