Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Unemployment Insurance – Recovery of Benefits – Refund of Payments
Sponsored by
Delegate Watson
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 651
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Labor to investigate claims that the Secretary recovered unemployment insurance benefits in excess of the amount included in a notice provided to a claimant and refund the claimant any excess funds; and requiring the Secretary to submit a monthly report to the General Assembly that includes certain information on investigated claims.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/12/2021
Legislative Date
10/12/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Unemployment Insurance – Recovery of Benefits – Refund of Payments
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Unemployment Insurance – Recovery of Benefits – Refund of Payments
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-0)
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 651
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/12/2021 10/12/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Unemployment Insurance – Recovery of Benefits – Refund of Payments
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Hearing 2/23 at 12:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2022 3/01/2022 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/02/2022 2/26/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Unemployment Insurance – Recovery of Benefits – Refund of Payments
House 3/04/2022 2/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (125-0) 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2022 2/25/2022 Referred Finance 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Hearing 3/23 at 1:15 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 4/04/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Favorable Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Second Reading Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Returned Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 651
Text - Chapter - Unemployment Insurance – Recovery of Benefits – Refund of Payments
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:05 PM
Click to return on the top page