Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

HB0003


CH0033

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Board of Education Residence Districts - Redistricting Plan MC 01-21SS
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 33
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the boundaries of the residence districts for the Montgomery County Board of Education.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0003
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/06/2021
Legislative Date
12/06/2021
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/02/2021
Legislative Date
12/02/2021
Action
Hearing 12/06 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/06/2021
Legislative Date
12/06/2021
Action
Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/06/2021
Legislative Date
12/06/2021
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (122-14)
Proceedings
1AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/06/2021
Legislative Date
12/06/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
1AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/06/2021
Legislative Date
12/06/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
1AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/07/2021
Legislative Date
12/07/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
2 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/07/2021
Legislative Date
12/06/2021
Action
Referred Reapportionment and Redistricting
Proceedings
1DClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/07/2021
Legislative Date
12/07/2021
Action
Hearing 12/08 at 9:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/08/2021
Legislative Date
12/08/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Reapportionment and Redistricting
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/08/2021
Legislative Date
12/07/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
2 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/08/2021
Legislative Date
12/07/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
2 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/08/2021
Legislative Date
12/08/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
3 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/08/2021
Legislative Date
12/07/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
2AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
1/08/2022
Legislative Date
1/08/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 33
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/06/2021 12/06/2021 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Montgomery County - Board of Education Residence Districts - Redistricting Plan MC 01-21SS
House 12/02/2021 12/02/2021 Hearing 12/06 at 12:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations Click to view Recorded Media
House 12/06/2021 12/06/2021 Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 12/06/2021 12/06/2021 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (122-14) 1AClick to view Recorded Media
House 12/06/2021 12/06/2021 Favorable Adopted 1AClick to view Recorded Media
House 12/06/2021 12/06/2021 Second Reading Passed 1AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Montgomery County - Board of Education Residence Districts - Redistricting Plan MC 01-21SS
House 12/07/2021 12/07/2021 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 2 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 12/07/2021 12/06/2021 Referred Reapportionment and Redistricting 1DClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 12/07/2021 12/07/2021 Hearing 12/08 at 9:30 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Reapportionment and Redistricting Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 12/08/2021 12/08/2021 Favorable Report by Reapportionment and Redistricting
Senate 12/08/2021 12/07/2021 Favorable Adopted 2 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 12/08/2021 12/07/2021 Second Reading Passed 2 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 12/08/2021 12/08/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 3 Click to view Recorded Media
House 12/08/2021 12/07/2021 Returned Passed 2AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 1/08/2022 1/08/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 33
(   3-901 )
Last Updated: 1/14/2022 12:07 PM
Click to return on the top page