Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Diapers - Exemption
Sponsored by
Delegate Crosby
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Synopsis
Exempting the sale of diapers from the sales and use tax.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0040 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/27/2021
Legislative Date
9/27/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Diapers - Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/04/2022
Legislative Date
1/04/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2022
Legislative Date
1/07/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/27/2021 9/27/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Diapers - Exemption
House 1/04/2022 1/04/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 11:00 a.m.
House 1/07/2022 1/07/2022 Hearing canceled
Last Updated: 1/12/2022 3:25 PM
Click to return on the top page