Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax – Work Opportunity Tax Credit
Sponsored by
Delegate Luedtke
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 6
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing employers that claim the federal work opportunity credit to claim a credit against the State income tax for certain wages paid to individuals with barriers to employment; allowing certain tax-exempt organizations to claim the credit under certain circumstances; altering the calculation of a certain subtraction modification for certain salary and wages paid to certain individuals; requiring the Department of Legislative Services to prepare a tax credit evaluation of the credit on or before December 31, 2028; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0598
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/28/2021
Legislative Date
9/28/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax – Work Opportunity Tax Credit
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2022
Legislative Date
1/07/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {343221/1 Adopted
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/2 (Delegate Shoemaker) Adopted
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Income Tax – Work Opportunity Tax Credit
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-0)
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 6
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Income Tax – Work Opportunity Tax Credit
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/28/2021 9/28/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax – Work Opportunity Tax Credit
House 1/07/2022 1/07/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/28/2022 2/28/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/01/2022 2/25/2022 Favorable with Amendments {343221/1 Adopted 18AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2022 2/25/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/2 (Delegate Shoemaker) Adopted 18AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2022 2/26/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax – Work Opportunity Tax Credit
House 3/04/2022 2/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (128-0) 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2022 2/25/2022 Referred Budget and Taxation 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2022 3/28/2022 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/28/2022 3/15/2022 Favorable Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2022 3/15/2022 Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/25/2022 Returned Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/01/2022 4/01/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 6
Text - Chapter - Income Tax – Work Opportunity Tax Credit
(   10-754 )
Last Updated: 7/27/2022 3:52 PM
Click to return on the top page