Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Statutes Text

Article - State Personnel and Pensions




§26–203.1.

    (a)    For members who transfer from the Employees’ Pension System or the Employees’ Retirement System, the Board of Trustees shall transfer to the accumulation fund of the Law Enforcement Officers’ Pension System the employer contributions that were made to the Employees’ Retirement System and the Employees’ Pension System on behalf of those members who transferred, plus the interest earned on those contributions through the date of transfer.

    (b)    For those full–time employees of the BWI Airport Fire & Rescue Department who were employed on or after October 1, 1993 and who elect membership in the Law Enforcement Officers’ Pension System on or before December 31, 2000, the Board of Trustees shall transfer to the accumulation fund of the Law Enforcement Officers’ Pension System the employer contributions made to the Employees’ Retirement System and the Employees’ Pension System on behalf of those transferring members, plus the interest earned on those contributions through the date of transfer.

    (c)    (1)    For members who transfer from a local pension system, the local pension system shall transfer to the Board of Trustees the employer contributions that were made to the local pension system on behalf of those members who transferred, plus the interest earned on those contributions through the date of transfer.

        (2)    The Board of Trustees shall deposit any funds transferred under paragraph (1) of this subsection in the accumulation fund of the Law Enforcement Officers’ Pension System.

    (d)    (1)    On or before January 1, 2006, for members who transfer from the Maryland Transit Administration Pension System established under § 7–603 of the Transportation Article, the Maryland Transit Administration shall transfer to the Board of Trustees the employer contributions made to the pension system established under § 7–603 of the Transportation Article on behalf of those members who transfer, plus the interest earned on those contributions through July 1, 2005.

        (2)    The Board of Trustees shall deposit any funds transferred under paragraph (1) of this subsection in the accumulation fund of the Law Enforcement Officers’ Pension System.

    (e)    (1)    This subsection applies to members of the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services Intelligence and Investigative Division who:

            (i)    have the powers granted to a police officer under § 10–701 of the Correctional Services Article; and

            (ii)    transfer to the Law Enforcement Officers’ Pension System on or before December 31, 2007.

        (2)    The Board of Trustees shall transfer to the accumulation fund of the Law Enforcement Officers’ Pension System the employer contributions made to the Correctional Officers’ Retirement System or the Employees’ Pension System on behalf of those members under paragraph (1) of this subsection, plus the interest earned on those contributions through the date of transfer.

    (f)    (1)    This subsection applies to a member of the Warrant Apprehension Unit, formerly of the Division of Parole and Probation in the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services, who:

            (i)    had the powers granted to a peace officer or police officer under the former § 6–106 of the Correctional Services Article; and

            (ii)    transferred to the Law Enforcement Officers’ Pension System on or before December 31, 2015.

        (2)    The Board of Trustees shall transfer to the accumulation fund of the Law Enforcement Officers’ Pension System the employer contributions made to the Employees’ Pension System on behalf of those members under paragraph (1) of this subsection, plus the interest earned on those contributions through the date of transfer.



Click to return on the top page