Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Statutes Text

Article - Real Property




§11B–112.3.

    (a)    In this section, “reserve study” means a study of the reserves required for future major repairs and replacement of the common areas of a homeowners association in Prince George’s County or Montgomery County that:

        (1)    Identifies each structural, mechanical, electrical, and plumbing component of the common areas and any other components that are the responsibility of the homeowners association to repair and replace;

        (2)    States the estimated remaining useful life of each identified component;

        (3)    States the estimated cost of repair or replacement of each identified component; and

        (4)    States the estimated annual reserve amount necessary to accomplish any identified future repair or replacement.

    (b)    (1)    This section applies only to a homeowners association in Prince George’s County or Montgomery County that has responsibility under its declaration for maintaining and repairing common areas.

        (2)    This section does not apply to a homeowners association that issues bonds for the purpose of meeting capital expenditures.

    (c)    (1)    This subsection applies only to a homeowners association established in:

            (i)    Prince George’s County on or after October 1, 2020; or

            (ii)    Montgomery County on or after October 1, 2021.

        (2)    The governing body of the homeowners association shall have an independent reserve study completed not more than 90 calendar days and not less than 30 calendar days before the meeting of the homeowners association required under § 11B–106.1(a) of this title.

        (3)    (i)    In Prince George’s County, the governing body shall have a reserve study completed within 5 years after the date of the initial reserve study conducted under paragraph (2) of this subsection and at least every 5 years thereafter.

            (ii)    In Montgomery County, the governing body shall have an updated reserve study completed within 5 years after the date of the initial reserve study conducted under paragraph (2) of this subsection, which shall be updated at least every 5 years thereafter.

    (d)    (1)    (i)    This paragraph applies only to a homeowners association established in Prince George’s County before October 1, 2020.

            (ii)    If the governing body of a homeowners association has had a reserve study conducted on or after October 1, 2016, the governing body shall have a reserve study conducted within 5 years after the date of that reserve study and at least every 5 years thereafter.

            (iii)    If the governing body of a homeowners association has not had a reserve study conducted on or after October 1, 2016, the governing body shall have a reserve study conducted on or before October 1, 2021, and at least every 5 years thereafter.

        (2)    (i)    This paragraph applies only to a homeowners association established in Montgomery County before October 1, 2021.

            (ii)    If the governing body of a homeowners association has had a reserve study conducted on or after October 1, 2017, the governing body shall have an updated reserve study conducted within 5 years after the date of that reserve study, which shall be updated at least every 5 years thereafter.

            (iii)    If the governing body of a homeowners association has not had a reserve study conducted on or after October 1, 2017, the governing body shall have a reserve study conducted on or before October 1, 2022, which shall be updated at least every 5 years thereafter.

    (e)    Each reserve study required under this section shall:

        (1)    Be prepared by a person who:

            (i)    Has prepared at least 30 reserve studies within the prior 3 calendar years;

            (ii)    Holds a bachelor’s degree in construction management, architecture, or engineering or equivalent experience and education;

            (iii)    Holds a current license from the State Board of Architects or the State Board for Professional Engineers; or

            (iv)    Is currently designated as a reserve specialist by the Community Association Institute or as a professional reserve analyst by the Association of Professional Reserve Analysts;

        (2)    Be available for inspection and copying by any lot owner;

        (3)    Be reviewed by the governing body of the homeowners association in connection with the preparation of the annual proposed budget; and

        (4)    Be summarized for submission with the annual proposed budget to the lot owners.



Click to return on the top page