Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Statutes Text

Article - Agriculture




§2–1603.    IN EFFECT

    // EFFECTIVE UNTIL SEPTEMBER 30, 2022 PER CHAPTERS 561 AND 562 OF 2013 //

    (a)    (1)    In accordance with paragraph (2) of this subsection, the Secretary shall establish a fee on each brand name or product name of commercial feed that is:

            (i)    Prepared and distributed for consumption by a dog or cat; and

            (ii)    Registered in the State under § 6–107 of this article.

        (2)    The fee established under this subsection is:

            (i)    From October 1, 2013, through September 30, 2014, inclusive, $50;

            (ii)    From October 1, 2014, through September 30, 2015, inclusive, $75; and

            (iii)    After September 30, 2015, $100.

    (b)    The fee established under subsection (a) of this section shall be paid by the person registering the commercial feed in accordance with the collection and reporting guidelines established by the Department by regulation.

    (c)    Any fee collected under this section shall be paid into the Fund.



Click to return on the top page