Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Reapportionment and Redistricting

Committee Chair king
Chair
Senator Nancy J. King
Vice Chair
Senator Antonio Hayes
Address
Annapolis, Maryland 21401
Phone
Toll-free in MD: 1-800-492-7122 ext. 5400
Further Information
Subscribe
Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0270 /CH0214 (HB0289/CH0213)
Title
Somerset County - Elections - County Commissioners Districts and Board of Education Candidate Filings
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 1
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0444
Title
Prince George’s County – School Board Districts – Redistricting Plan
Sponsor
Prince George's County Senators
4 1
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0641 /CH0102
Title
Carroll County - County Commissioner Districts - Redistricting Plan
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 1
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1012 /CH0016
Title
Congressional Districting Plan
Sponsor
President
6 1
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0002 /JR0001 (HJ0002)
Title
Legislative Districting Plan of 2022
Sponsor
President
6 1
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0003 (HJ0001)
Title
Maryland Citizens' Legislative Districting Plan of 2022
Sponsor
President
3 1
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0289 /CH0213 (SB0270/CH0214)
Title
Somerset County – Elections – County Commissioners Districts and Board of Education Candidate Filings
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0503 /CH0105
Title
Montgomery County - Board of Education Residence Districts - Ken Gar Neighborhood MC 26-22
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1473
Title
Prince George's County - School Board Districts - Redistricting Plan PG 507-22
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0270 /CH0214 (HB0289/CH0213) Somerset County - Elections - County Commissioners Districts and Board of Education Candidate Filings Senator Carozza 2 1 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Reapportionment and Redistricting
2/17/2022 - 11:30 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0444 Prince George’s County – School Board Districts – Redistricting Plan Prince George's County Senators 4 1 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Reapportionment and Redistricting
2/17/2022 - 11:30 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
4/06/2022 - 11:00 AM
SB0641 /CH0102 Carroll County - County Commissioner Districts - Redistricting Plan Carroll County Senators 4 1 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 102
Reapportionment and Redistricting
2/17/2022 - 11:30 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1012 /CH0016 Congressional Districting Plan President 6 1 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 16
Reapportionment and Redistricting
3/29/2022 - 8:30 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SJ0002 /JR0001 (HJ0002) Legislative Districting Plan of 2022 President 6 1 Enacted under Article III, Section 5 of the Maryland Constitution Assigned a resolution number - Joint Resolution 1
Reapportionment and Redistricting
1/18/2022 - 3:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SJ0003 (HJ0001) Maryland Citizens' Legislative Districting Plan of 2022 President 3 1 In the Senate - Hearing 1/18 at 3:00 p.m.
Reapportionment and Redistricting
1/18/2022 - 3:00 PM
HB0289 /CH0213 (SB0270/CH0214) Somerset County – Elections – County Commissioners Districts and Board of Education Candidate Filings Delegate Otto 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/16/2022 - 10:00 AM
Reapportionment and Redistricting
HB0503 /CH0105 Montgomery County - Board of Education Residence Districts - Ken Gar Neighborhood MC 26-22 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/16/2022 - 10:00 AM
Reapportionment and Redistricting
4/04/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB1473 Prince George's County - School Board Districts - Redistricting Plan PG 507-22 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2022 - 8:30 AM
Reapportionment and Redistricting
Denotes enacted legislation
As of:
Chair
King, Nancy J.
District 39
Montgomery County
Democrat
Vice Chair
Hayes, Antonio
District 40
Baltimore City
Democrat

Analyses/Regulation
COMAR Title/Subtitle DLS Control No. Reg Type Agency Analysis Reg
Last Updated: 5/2/2022 10:28 AM
Click to return on the top page