Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 1/26/2021 2:05:33 PM
Tuesday, January 26, 2021
Tuesday, January 26, 2021
Senate
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
Change made: January 26, 2021 11:18 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
February 11, 2021 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0477
Sen McCray, et al

Enoch Pratt Free Library - Operating Hours and Funding
REMOVED: 11:18 AM

Finance Committee
Change made: January 26, 2021 12:29 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
January 27, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0255
Sen Hershey

Commercial Law – Maryland Credit Services Business Act – Revisions
REMOVED: 12:29 PM

House
Early Childhood Subcommittee
Change made: January 26, 2021 11:25 AM - HEARING ADDED
Early Childhood Subcommittee - Voting Session
January 28, 2021 12:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0155
Del Wilkins

County Boards and Public and Nonpublic Prekindergarten Programs and Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
HB0392
Del Guyton

Child Care Centers - Early Childhood Screening and Assistance

Environment and Transportation Committee
Change made: January 26, 2021 10:42 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
January 29, 2021 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0381
Del Long

Animal Shelters - Standards of Operation
REMOVED: 10:42 AM

Change made: January 26, 2021 12:37 PM - HEARING ADDED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 9, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0036
Del Lierman, et al

Environment – Packaging, Containers, and Paper Products – Producer Responsibility
HB0058
Del Lierman

Workgroup on Minority Homeownership, Neighborhood Revitalization, and Household Wealth Equity
HB0099
Del Love

Beverage Container Deposit Program - Establishment and Advisory Commission
HB0280
Del Charkoudian

Maryland Recycling Act - Recyclable Materials and Resource Recovery Facilities - Alterations
HB0485
Del Solomon

Public-Private Partnerships - Process and Oversight
HB0560
Del Fennell

Human Relations - Discrimination in Housing - Reentry-Into-Society Status
HB0593
Del Fraser-Hidalgo

Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Meeting Requirements
HB0663
Del Boteler

Local Government - Regulation of Amateur Radio Station Antenna Structures

Change made: January 26, 2021 12:43 PM - HEARING ADDED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 10, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0545
Del Hornberger

Natural Resources – Licenses, Permits, Registrations, and Certificates – Digital or Electronic Format
HB0563
Del Long

Local Government – Animal Control Facilities – Adoption Fee Waiver for Veterans (Pets for Vets Act of 2021)
HB0579
Del Hornberger

Snare Traps - Prohibition Against Sale or Possession - Alterations
HB0594
Del Fraser-Hidalgo

Prohibition on Sale of Wildlife - Local Venison Donation Programs - Application
HB0631
Del Beitzel

State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Purpose, Use, and Funding - Sunset Extension

Change made: January 26, 2021 12:48 PM - HEARING ADDED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 11, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0592
Del Fraser-Hidalgo

State Vehicle Fleet - Conversion to Zero-Emission Electric Vehicles
HB0595
Del Fraser-Hidalgo

Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements
HB0649
Del Anderton

Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Revenue and Distribution

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: January 26, 2021 12:13 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
February 5, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0630
Del Solomon

Primary and Secondary Education – School District Energy Use – Policy and Study
REMOVED: 10:03 AM
HB0192
Del Guyton

Public Schools - Special Education Classrooms - Use of Video
REMOVED: 12:13 PM

Change made: January 26, 2021 12:47 PM - HEARING ADDED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
February 11, 2021 1:30 PM
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
HB0661
Del Chisholm

Income Tax - Expensing of Business Property and Bonus Depreciation - Recoupling With Federal Law
HB0711
Del D. Jones

Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Donations to Diaper Banks and Other Charitable Entities
HB0712
Del D. Jones

Bureau of Revenue Estimates - Tax Incidence Study - Scope
HB0733
The Spkr (Admin)

Retirement Tax Reduction Act of 2021
HB0734
The Spkr (Admin)

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income
HB0735
The Spkr (Admin)

Income Tax Subtraction Modification – Correctional Officers, Law Enforcement Officers, and Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel (Hometown Heroes Act)

Other
School Construction, Interagency Commission on
Change made: January 26, 2021 9:51 AM - HEARING ADDED
School Construction, Interagency Commission on - Other
February 11, 2021 9:00 AM
On-Line Meeting
Public teleconference to discuss normal IAC business.

Change made: January 26, 2021 9:55 AM - HEARING ADDED
School Construction, Interagency Commission on - Other
March 11, 2021 9:00 AM
On-Line Meeting
Public teleconference to discuss normal IAC business.