Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 1/21/2021 10:03:16 AM
Thursday, January 21, 2021
Thursday, January 21, 2021
Senate
Judicial Proceedings Committee
Change made: January 21, 2021 8:44 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
February 4, 2021 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0124
Sen Carter

Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Court Fines - Payment
REMOVED: 8:44 AM

House
Appropriations Committee
Change made: January 21, 2021 10:01 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 3, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0046
Del Griffith

Education - Student Horizon Database and Scorecard (Students Right to Know Act of 2021)
REMOVED: 10:01 AM

Change made: January 21, 2021 10:02 AM - HEARING ADDED
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 10, 2021 1:30 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
HB0046
Del Griffith

Education - Student Horizon Database and Scorecard (Students Right to Know Act of 2021)
HB0184
Del Ivey

University System of Maryland, Morgan State University, and St. Mary's College of Maryland - Board Membership - Alterations

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: January 21, 2021 9:19 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
February 2, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0441
Del McKay

Department of Assessments and Taxation - Identification Number for Business - Task Force
ADDED: 9:19 AM
HB0544
Del Hornberger

Presidential Elections - Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote - Repeal
ADDED: 9:19 AM
HB0557
Del Long

Homestead Property Tax Credit - Calculation of Credit for Dwelling Purchased by First-Time Homebuyer
ADDED: 9:19 AM
HB0559
Del Long

Baltimore County - Property Tax - Homeowners Property Tax Credit
ADDED: 9:19 AM
HB0570
Del Long

Homestead Property Tax Credit Program - Notice of Eligibility - Lead Registry and Code Compliance
ADDED: 9:19 AM
HB0571
Montgomery County Delegation

Montgomery County - Disabled Active Duty Service Members, Disabled Veterans, and Surviving Spouses - Property Tax Abatement MC 20-21
ADDED: 9:19 AM
HB0573
Del Long

Baltimore County – Overdue Property Taxes – Waiver of Interest and Penalties
ADDED: 9:19 AM
HB0576
Del Hornberger

Election Law - Political Clubs
ADDED: 9:19 AM
HB0591
Del R. Watson

Property Tax Exemption – Disabled Veterans
ADDED: 9:19 AM
HB0610
Del Hill

Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Transfer of Dwelling to Surviving Family Member
ADDED: 9:19 AM

Change made: January 21, 2021 9:19 AM - HEARING ADDED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
February 3, 2021 1:30 PM
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
HB0138
Del Johnson

Education - Sexual Abuse and Assault Awareness and Prevention Program - Human and Sex Trafficking
HB0266
Del Cox

Student Education Equity Grant Program - Established (Student Education Equity in Funding Act)
HB0377
Del Bagnall

Commission on Student Behavioral Health and Mental Health Treatment
HB0439
Del Guyton

Institute for Innovation and Implementation - Pregnant, Expecting, and Parenting Students - Data Collection and Report
HB0461
Del Washington

Public Schools - Student Attendance - Excused Absences for Mental Health Needs
HB0465
Del Washington

State Superintendent of Schools - Qualifications and Senate Confirmation
HB0468
Del Forbes

Baltimore County - School Board Nominating Commission - Vacancy Procedures
HB0496
Del Wilkins

Primary and Secondary Education - Mental Health Services - Expansion (Counselors Not Cops Act)
HB0522
Del Washington

Public Schools - School Resource Officers - Prohibited Conduct
HB0597
Del Kelly

Child Care Centers - Teacher Qualifications

Change made: January 21, 2021 9:19 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
February 4, 2021 1:30 PM
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
HB0582
Cecil County Delegation

Cecil County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Federal Facilities Redevelopment Areas
ADDED: 9:19 AM
HB0612
The Spkr (Admin)

Recovery for the Economy, Livelihoods, Industries, Entrepreneurs, and Families (RELIEF) Act
ADDED: 9:19 AM