Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 10/20/2020 7:33:41 PM
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
Other
Joint Covid-19 Response Legislative Workgroup
Change made: October 20, 2020 9:09 AM - HEARING ADDED
Joint Covid-19 Response Legislative Workgroup - Other
October 28, 2020 10:00 AM
Zoom Meeting

Maryland Community Health Resources Commission
Change made: October 20, 2020 1:04 PM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Community Health Resources Commission - Other
October 29, 2020 10:00 AM
Conference Call
Regular Meeting of the Maryland Community Health Resources Commission.

Maryland Life Sciences Advisory Board
Change made: October 20, 2020 8:11 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Life Sciences Advisory Board - Other
November 20, 2020 1:00 PM to November 20, 2020 3:00 PM
Google Meet Video Conference
Virtual Meeting to discuss issues pertaining to the Maryland life sciences community.