Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 1/20/2021 2:54:39 PM
Wednesday, January 20, 2021
Wednesday, January 20, 2021
Senate
Budget and Taxation Committee
Change made: January 20, 2021 10:35 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Briefing
January 25, 2021 3:00 PM
Virtual Meeting
(Previous Location: Zoom / YouTube)
Fiscal Briefing

Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
Change made: January 20, 2021 12:02 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
January 20, 2021 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0231
Sen Hester

Public Schools - Cyber Safety Guide and Training Course - Development, Implementation, and Reporting
REMOVED: 12:02 PM

Change made: January 20, 2021 11:51 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Voting Session
January 21, 2021 4:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0067
Chr EHE (Dept)

Emergency Medical Services – Paramedics – Vaccination Administration
ADDED: 11:51 AM

Change made: January 20, 2021 11:49 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
January 28, 2021 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0414
Sen Pinsky, et al

Climate Solutions Now Act of 2021
ADDED: 11:49 AM

Judicial Proceedings Committee
Change made: January 20, 2021 9:21 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Briefing
February 16, 2021 1:00 PM
Virtual Meeting

House
Appropriations Committee
Change made: January 20, 2021 9:38 AM - HEARING ADDED
Appropriations Committee - Voting Session
January 22, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0001
The Spkr

Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding

Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: January 20, 2021 10:47 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 3, 2021 2:30 PM
(Previous Date/Time: February 3, 2021 2:00 PM)
Zoom / YouTube
HB0207
Del Wilson

Nursing Homes - Resident Change in Condition - Notification
HB0303
Del Stewart

Long-Term Care Insurance - Prohibition on Premium Increases (Long Term Stability for Seniors Act
HB0416
Del Belcastro

Health Care Facilities - Assisted Living Programs - Memory Care and Alzheimer's Disease Unit Regulations

Judiciary Committee
Change made: January 20, 2021 2:00 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
February 4, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0331
Del Johnson

Criminal Procedure - Questioning of Minors by Police Officers
REMOVED: 2:00 PM

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: January 20, 2021 12:41 PM - HEARING ADDED
Ways and Means Committee - Voting Session
January 22, 2021 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0006
Del Feldmark

Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Alterations
HB0171
Del Washington

State Department of Education - School Discipline - Data Collection
HB0237
Del Ebersole

State Department of Education - Early Literacy and Dyslexia Practices - Guidance and Assistance
HB0320
Del Smith

Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Transfer of Student Data - Modifications
HB0358
Del Wilson

Income Tax Checkoff - Maryland Veterans Trust Fund
HB0373
Del Wilson

Education - Child Abuse and Sexual Misconduct Prevention - Hiring Emergent Employees
HB0394
Del Smith

Public Schools - Fees for Summer School Courses - Prohibition

Change made: January 20, 2021 10:35 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
February 4, 2021 1:30 PM
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
HB0546
Del Hornberger

Video Lottery Operator - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Uncollectible Debt
ADDED: 10:35 AM
HB0553
Del Ebersole

State Lottery Tickets - Prohibition on Internet Sales - Repeal
ADDED: 10:35 AM

Other
Montgomery
Change made: January 20, 2021 7:54 AM - HEARING ADDED
Montgomery - Other
January 22, 2021 10:00 AM
Zoom Meeting
Discussion of legislation and other business relevant to Montgomery County.

Change made: January 20, 2021 7:57 AM - HEARING ADDED
Montgomery - Other
January 25, 2021 11:00 AM
Zoom Meeting
Discussion of legislation assigned to the Montgomery County House Delegation Land Use, Transportation, and Public Safety Committee