Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 3/6/2021 7:04:37 PM
Saturday, March 6, 2021
Saturday, March 6, 2021
Senate
Budget and Taxation Committee
Change made: March 6, 2021 1:20 PM - HEARING ADDED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Voting Session
March 9, 2021 8:30 AM to March 9, 2021 10:30 AM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD

Change made: March 6, 2021 1:20 PM - HEARING ADDED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Voting Session
March 10, 2021 3:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD

Change made: March 6, 2021 1:20 PM - HEARING ADDED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Voting Session
March 12, 2021 10:00 AM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD

House
Civil Law and Procedure Subcommittee
Change made: March 6, 2021 2:32 PM - HEARING ADDED
Civil Law and Procedure Subcommittee - Work Session
March 8, 2021 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
- HBs: 23, 308, 405, 766, 772, 848, 870, 1250, 1261, 1264, 1266

Judiciary Committee
Change made: March 6, 2021 2:32 PM - HEARING ADDED
Judiciary Committee - Voting Session
March 8, 2021 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0052
Del Wells

Real Property - Alterations in Actions for Repossession and Establishment of Eviction Diversion Program
HB0128
Del Stewart

Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Protected Groups and Penalties
HB0180
Del Clippinger

Juveniles - Sexting
HB0231
Del Palakovich Carr

Crimes – Mitigation – Race, Color, National Origin, Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation
HB0260
Del W. Fisher

Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
HB0270
Del K. Young

Criminal Procedure - Victims of Sexually Assaultive Behavior - Required Meeting
HB0505
Del Dumais

Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time
HB0701
Del McComas

Child Abuse and Neglect - Training of Health Care Professionals
HB0748
Del Atterbeary

Family Law – Child Custody and Visitation
HB1312
Del Wilkins

COVID-19 Eviction and Housing Relief Act of 2021

Click to return on the top page