Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Meetings

Day(s)

As of: 1/19/2021 7:40:19 PM
Thursday, December 17, 2020
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Canceled
Appropriations Committee - Work Session
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - (Appropriations Committee)
Created: 12/3/2020 4:07 PM
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - Briefing
3:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Briefing on MEDCO operated student housing at University of Maryland- College Park and Towson University.

Other
Juvenile Justice Reform Council
Created: 10/9/2020 12:25 PM
9:00 AM to 11:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
On-Line Council Meeting
The meeting will be open to the public for viewing only (no participation).
A link will be provided to the public in advance of the meeting.
(Removed - 12/10/2020 11:43 AM)