Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Meetings

Day(s)

As of: 1/19/2021 7:28:27 PM
Wednesday, December 16, 2020
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Oversight Committee on Personnel - (Appropriations Committee)
Created: 12/3/2020 5:42 PM
Oversight Committee on Personnel - Briefing
2:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Briefing on the health and safety of State employees during the COVID-19 pandemic.
(Added - 12/3/2020 5:43 PM)

Created: 11/16/2020 3:46 PM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Briefing
9:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
Virtual Farm Tour
(Added - 11/16/2020 3:47 PM)

Other
Board of Public Works
Created: 9/2/2020 2:20 PM
10:00 AM - Governor's Reception Room, 2nd Floor State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis, MD
The meeting will be conducted via webinar. To view click here
General Meeting

Joint Committee on Fair Practices and State Personnel Oversight
Created: 12/8/2020 10:41 AM
1:00 PM - Zoom Meeting
On-going review of Maryland Environmental Services Personnel and Board Practices.

Joint Covid-19 Response Legislative Workgroup
Created: 12/15/2020 11:11 AM
10:00 AM - Virtual Briefing