Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Meetings

Day(s)

As of: 1/19/2021 8:39:35 PM
Thursday, December 10, 2020
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Health and Social Services Subcommittee - (Appropriations Committee)
Created: 12/3/2020 5:53 PM
Health and Social Services Subcommittee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Briefing on MDH procurement policies and COVID-19 vaccine distribution.

Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee - (Health and Government Operations Committee)
Created: 12/1/2020 3:29 PM
Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
- The Public Health and Minority Health Subcommittee and Government Operations and Facilities Subcommittee (with members of the House Appropriations Health and Social Services Subcommittee):
(Added - 12/8/2020 10:26 AM)
1) Briefing: Maryland Department of Health on Procurement Policies and COVID-19 Vaccine Distribution Plan
(Added - 12/8/2020 10:26 AM)
2) Update from the Medical Cannabis Commission
(Added - 12/8/2020 10:26 AM)
- The Government Operations and Facilities Subcommittee will also hold a briefing at this time. More info to come.
(Removed - 12/1/2020 3:30 PM)
- The Government Operations and Facilities Subcommittee will also hold a briefing at this time. More info to come.
(Removed - 12/8/2020 10:26 AM)
- Update from the Maryland Medical Cannabis Commission
(Removed - 12/8/2020 10:26 AM)

Other
Joint Committee on Fair Practices and State Personnel Oversight
Created: 12/4/2020 3:34 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom Meeting
On-going review of Maryland Environmental Service Personnel and Board Practices.

Juvenile Justice Reform Council
Created: 9/23/2020 7:43 AM
9:00 AM to 11:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
On-Line Council Meeting
The meeting will be open to the public for viewing only (no participation).
A link will be provided to the public in advance of the meeting.
(Removed - 12/3/2020 2:57 PM)

School Construction, Interagency Commission on
Created: 11/10/2020 3:55 PM
9:00 AM - On-Line Meeting
To watch click on livestream, and click on "Youtube Live Stream" under the appropriate date.
Additional meeting information will be available at iac.maryland.gov
Public teleconference to discuss the 75% CIP Approval and normal IAC business.