Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Meetings

Day(s)

As of: 1/19/2021 8:35:54 PM
Tuesday, December 8, 2020
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Criminal Sentencing Policy, State Commission On
Created: 10/7/2020 11:56 AM
5:00 PM - On-Line Meeting
Click here for a livestream and registration link
Members of the public are invited to address the Commission with their concerns about sentencing policy issues in Maryland.
Instructions for participation in the videoconference will be provided upon registration approval.
To accomodate all who wish to participate in the meeting, the Commission requests that each speaker limit his or her comments to five minutes. The Commission Chair will enforce this limit.
All who are interested in speaking are asked to register via the registration link above or go to http://msccsp.org/About/Meetings.aspx
All registered participants are asked to submit written testimony at least three days prior to the hearing. Please email written testimony to David Soule, Executive Director of the Commission, at dsoule@umd.edu

Created: 10/7/2020 12:03 PM
6:30 PM - On-Line Meeting
Click here for a link to the livestream meeting
The Commission will continue the review and evaluation of the State's sentencing guidelines and policies.

Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee
Created: 8/11/2020 1:02 PM
10:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
Audit: Maryland Department of Transportation - Motor Vehicle Administration (September 2020).
(Added - 11/12/2020 4:48 PM)
Audit: State Department of Assessments and Taxation (October 2020).
(Added - 11/12/2020 4:48 PM)
Office of Legislative Audits (OLA): Fraud Activity Update.
(Added - 11/12/2020 4:48 PM)
OLA: Summary of Audit Reports and Recommended Action.
(Added - 11/12/2020 4:48 PM)
OLA: Report on Follow up and Repeat Audit Findings.
(Added - 11/12/2020 4:48 PM)
Certain Audits and Performance Evaluations.
(Removed - 11/12/2020 4:48 PM)
Report on Follow up and Repeat Audit Findings.
(Removed - 11/12/2020 4:48 PM)
Summary of Audit Reports and Recommended Action.
(Removed - 11/12/2020 4:48 PM)

Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission
Created: 11/30/2020 8:35 AM
Briefing
2:00 PM to 3:00 PM - Virtual Briefing
Briefings from the Maryland Health Benefits Exchange on (1) State-based Individual Market Subsidies and (2) the Impact of Covid-19 on Open Enrollment.