Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Meetings

Day(s)

As of: 1/26/2021 3:49:40 AM
Friday, November 20, 2020
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee - (Appropriations Committee)
Created: 11/6/2020 3:53 PM
Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee - Briefing
10:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
10:00 AM - Virtual Briefing

Created: 11/13/2020 11:14 AM
Judiciary Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
1:00 PM - Virtual Briefing
- Maryland Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services

Other
Maryland Life Sciences Advisory Board
Created: 10/20/2020 8:11 AM
1:00 PM to 3:00 PM - Google Meet Video Conference
Meeting Video
Teleconference dial in: 218-301-2704
PIN: 399 068 906#
Virtual Meeting to discuss issues pertaining to the Maryland life sciences community.