Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Meetings

Day(s)

As of: 1/26/2021 3:54:59 AM
Thursday, November 19, 2020
Senate
Health and Human Services Subcommittee - (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Created: 10/14/2020 3:22 PM
Health and Human Services Subcommittee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
1:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
Update on the Performance of Optum, the Administrative Services Organization for the Public Behavioral Health System
(Joint with the Senate Finance Committee)

Created: 10/14/2020 1:07 PM
Finance Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
1:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
(1) Update on the Performance of Optum, the Administrative Services Organization for the Public Behavioral Health System
(Joint with the Senate Budget and Taxation Health and Human Services Subcommittee)
(2) Review of the Expansion of Telehealth

House
Education Subcommittee - (Ways and Means Committee)
Created: 11/12/2020 11:27 AM
Education Subcommittee - Briefing
2:00 PM to 4:00 PM - Virtual Meeting

Other
Joint Committee on the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area
Created: 11/10/2020 11:16 AM
1:00 PM - Virtual Briefing
Briefing on updates of the Critical Area Commission for the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays and legislative and regulatory critical area efforts in Virginia and Pennsylvania from the Chesapeake Bay Commission.

Juvenile Justice Reform Council
Created: 9/23/2020 7:41 AM
9:00 AM to 11:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
On-Line Council Meeting
The meeting will be open to the public for viewing only (no participation).
A link will be provided to the public in advance of the meeting.
(Removed - 11/13/2020 6:43 AM)