Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 10/31/2020 7:11:01 AM
Wednesday, October 14, 2020
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Created: 10/8/2020 5:33 PM
Economic Matters Committee - Briefing
3:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Briefing on mortgage forbearance, foreclosure prevention, and programs to assist homeowners and businesses during the COVID-19 Pandemic.

Other
Capital Debt Affordability Committee
Created: 9/21/2020 4:53 PM
10:00 AM - On-Line Meeting
Webinar link will be posted on the Treasurer's website
Review of tax supported debt and the size and condition of debt of higher education institutions.

Joint Committee on Federal Relations
Created: 9/9/2020 5:24 PM
Briefing
9:30 AM - On-Line Meeting
Briefing by the Military Department regarding out-of-state, domestic deployment of the Maryland National Guard for law enforcement purposes.
Briefing by the American Public Human Services Association and the Maryland Department of Human Services regarding the Interstate Compact for the Placement of Children (as a replacement for the existing Interstate Compact on the Placement of Children).
(Added - 10/7/2020 8:34 AM)
(Presenting agencies/organizations to posted soon.)
(Removed - 10/7/2020 8:34 AM)
Briefing regarding the Interstate Compact for Children (as a replacement for the existing Interstate Compact on the Placement of Children).
(Removed - 10/7/2020 8:34 AM)