Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 10/31/2020 6:25:03 AM
Thursday, September 17, 2020
Senate
Created: 9/11/2020 4:35 PM
Finance Committee - Briefing
3:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Briefing on Unemployment Insurance

House
Created: 9/13/2020 1:20 PM
Economic Matters Committee - Briefing
3:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Briefing by the Maryland Department of Labor
Meeting Material
Meeting Video
Unemployment Insurance Update

Other
Juvenile Justice Reform Council
Created: 9/10/2020 12:02 PM
9:00 AM to 11:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
On-line Council Meeting
The meeting will be open to the public for viewing only (no participation)
A link will be provided to the public in advance of the meeting.

Police Reform and Accountability in Maryland, Workgroup to Address
Created: 9/8/2020 11:36 AM
1:00 PM - Zoom Meeting
The meeting will be open to the public for viewing only (no participation).
A link will be provided to the public before the hearing begins.

Quality Care in Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities, Oversight Committee on
Created: 7/30/2020 4:26 PM
1:30 PM to 2:30 PM - Conference Call
General Meeting of the Oversight Committee
Call-In-Phone #: +1-234-901-1406
PIN: 535 854 468#

Student Data Privacy Council
Created: 9/3/2020 10:18 AM
9:00 AM to 11:00 AM - Conference Call
Monthly Meeting
To join by phone: 1-855-797-9480 US Toll Free
Access code: 161 548 0220