Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 10/31/2020 5:54:00 AM
Monday, September 14, 2020
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission
Created: 8/13/2020 10:43 AM
Briefing
2:00 PM to 3:00 PM - On-Line Meeting
Meeting Material
To view the meeting click here
Update on the Maryland Reinsurance Program.
Briefing on the funding of reinsurance programs in other states.

Maryland Manufacturing Advisory Board
Created: 9/4/2020 2:12 PM
2:00 PM - Conference Call
Maryland Manufacturing Advisory Board
Call-in Phone #: 1-912-712-4180
PIN: 468 124 879

Restore Trust in Policing, Commission to
Created: 8/28/2020 1:32 PM
2:00 PM - Zoom Meeting
Please see the Commission webpage for the agenda and meeting updates
Meeting Video
The meeting will be open to the public for viewing only (no participation).
(Added - 8/31/2020 8:40 AM)
A link will be provided to the public before the hearing begins.
(Added - 8/31/2020 8:40 AM)