Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 10/31/2020 7:12:53 AM
Wednesday, September 9, 2020
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Created: 8/31/2020 3:21 PM
Economic Matters Committee - Briefing
3:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Briefing by the Maryland Department of Labor
Meeting Material
Meeting Video
•Overview of leave (paid or unpaid) available to employees of various sized employers for COVID-related reasons; and
•Overview of actions by Maryland Occupational Safety and Health (MOSH) to assist employers and employees in implementing COVID protocols or best practices.

Created: 9/1/2020 5:01 PM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Briefing
9:30 AM - Virtual Meeting

Other
Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness
Created: 9/2/2020 1:00 PM
Briefing
1:00 PM - On-Line Meeting
Meeting Material
To view the meeting click here
Briefings on State and local efforts to address evictions and foreclosures.

Maryland Life Sciences Advisory Board
Created: 8/13/2020 10:38 AM
11:30 AM to 1:30 PM - Conference Call
Dial-In #: +1 530-564-6850 PIN: 180 509 762#
Virtual meeting to discuss issues pertaining to the Maryland life sciences community.