Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 9/26/2020 1:24:49 AM
Thursday, August 20, 2020
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Created: 7/27/2020 10:06 AM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Work Session
9:30 AM - Virtual Meeting

Other
School Construction, Interagency Commission on
Created: 7/13/2020 3:28 PM
Thursday, August 13, 2020 9:00 AM to 1:00 PM - On-Line Meeting
9:00 AM to 12:00 PM - On-Line Meeting
To view the meeting click on livestream , and click on "Youtube Live Stream", under the appropriate date. Additional meeting information will be available at iac.maryland.gov
Public teleconference to discuss normal IAC business.