Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 2/25/2021 3:07:44 PM
Friday, January 29, 2021
Senate
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority
(Removed - 1/25/2021 11:39 AM)

Created: 1/28/2021 2:06 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Voting Session
Thursday, January 28, 2021 1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
The voting session will begin approximately 30 minutes after the conclusion of the bill hearings.
Sen Sydnor, et al

Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding
(Jointly assigned to Budget and Taxation\Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)

Created: 1/25/2021 2:05 PM
Finance Committee - Voting Session
11:00 AM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Sen Hettleman

Maryland Office of the Inspector General for Health
(Added - 1/26/2021 5:25 PM)
Sen Kelley

Electricity - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying Biomass
(Added - 1/26/2021 5:25 PM)
Sen Kramer

Business Regulation – Retail Pet Stores – Modifications (No More Puppy– and Kitten–Mills Act of 2021)
(Added - 1/26/2021 5:25 PM)
Sen Kramer

Health Care Facilities – Dialysis Treatment Services – Training (David Selby Dialysis Parity Act)
(Added - 1/26/2021 5:25 PM)
Chr FIN (Dept)

Insurance - Credit for Reinsurance Model Law - Revisions
(Added - 1/26/2021 5:25 PM)
Sen Simonaire

Veterans - Behavioral Health Services - Mental Health First Aid
(Added - 1/26/2021 5:25 PM)
Chr FIN (Dept)

Transportation–Related Property and Copper or Aluminum Items – Duties, Prohibited Acts, and Enforcement
(Added - 1/26/2021 5:25 PM)
Chr FIN (Dept)

Financial Institutions – Commissioner of Financial Regulation – Money Transmissions
(Added - 1/26/2021 5:25 PM)
Chr FIN (Dept)

Arts and Entertainment Districts – Artistic Work and Arts and Entertainment Enterprise – Definitions
(Added - 1/26/2021 5:25 PM)
Sen Lam

Public Health - Prohibition on Testing Cosmetics on Animals
(Added - 1/26/2021 5:25 PM)
Sen Guzzone

Labor and Employment - Direct Care Workforce Innovation Program
(Jointly assigned to Finance\Budget and Taxation)
(Added - 1/26/2021 5:25 PM)

Created: 1/28/2021 12:20 PM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Work Session
Thursday, January 28, 2021 2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Police Reform
Agenda

This meeting will be streamed live on YouTube but if you would like to be an active viewer, here is the Zoom link: Link to join Webinar https://zoom.us/j/97744507858

House
Created: 1/27/2021 2:58 PM
Appropriations Committee - Voting Session
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Washington

Maryland Higher Education Outreach and College Access Pilot Program - Alterations (Maryland College Access Act)
Del Korman

State Finance and Procurement - Appropriation Reductions (Board of Public Works Budget Reduction Clarification Act)
Del Qi

Mobile Laundry for the Homeless Pilot Program
Del Carr

Maryland Funding Accountability and Transparency Act - Nonbudgeted State Agencies
Del Guyton

State Child Welfare System - Reporting
Del Rosenberg

Maryland Technology Internship Program - Qualifications for Participation - Alterations
Del Pena-Melnyk

Governor's Office of Immigrant Affairs
(Added - 1/27/2021 6:47 PM)

Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - (Appropriations Committee)
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority
(Removed - 1/25/2021 11:39 AM)

Created: 1/20/2021 3:31 PM
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del D.E. Davis

Public Service Commission - Virtual Public Hearings
Del D.E. Davis

Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard – Wastewater, Thermal, and Other Renewable Sources
Del D.E. Davis

Public Utilities - Annual Reports
Del D.E. Davis

Electricity and Gas - Limited-Income Mechanisms
Del D.E. Davis

For-Hire Driving and Vehicles - Requirements
(Removed - 1/22/2021 2:34 PM)

Created: 12/22/2020 4:39 PM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Lehman, et al

Department of Agriculture - Spay/Neuter Fund - Extension and Fee on Commercial Feed
Dels Healey and Stein

Agriculture – Neonicotinoid Pesticides – Sale and Storage
Del Love

Environment – Recycling – Prohibition on the Chemical Conversion of Plastic
Del Chang

Criminal Law - Humane Society and Animal Control Officers - Education and Training Requirements
Del Long

Animal Shelters - Standards of Operation
(Removed - 1/26/2021 10:42 AM)

Created: 1/27/2021 7:21 PM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Voting Session
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Shetty

Environment – Statewide Green Business Certification Program – Establishment
Del Rogers

Energy Efficiency - Net-Zero Homes - Contract Preferences
Del Lehman, et al

Crimes - Unattended Dogs in Extreme Weather Conditions
Del D. Jones, et al

Vehicle Laws - School Bus Safety - Occupant Capacity
Dels Stein and Malone

Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Dels Stein and Lierman

Department of the Environment – Office of Recycling – Recycling Market Development
Del Fraser-Hidalgo

Maryland Agricultural Commission – Hemp Industry Member
Del Fraser-Hidalgo

Commercial Motor Vehicles - Inspections
Del Wells

Department of Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Grant Program
Del Stein

Natural Resources - Organized Killing Contests - Restriction
Del Stein

Driver's Licenses - Older Licensees - In-Person Renewal
Del Stein

Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation
Del Carr

Vehicle Laws - Intersections - Prohibited Acts
Del Carr

Vehicle Laws - Failure to Pay Video Toll - Penalties
Del Lierman

Maryland Public Ethics Law - Retaliation for Reporting or Participating in Investigation - Prohibition
Del Sample-Hughes

Real Property - Sale of Mobile Home Parks - Notice Requirements
Del Hartman, et al

Solid Waste Management – Prohibition on Releasing a Balloon Into the Atmosphere
Del Krimm

Real Property – Required Notices for Contracts of Sale – Zones of Dewatering Influence

Created: 1/27/2021 11:45 AM
Judiciary Committee - Voting Session
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Shetty

Family Law - Mandatory Reporter Training
Del Shetty

Action for Change of Name - Waiver of Publication Requirement
Del Shetty

Criminal Law - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adult or Elderly Individual - Undue Influence
Del D.M. Davis

Correctional Services - Inmate Cost-of-Living Report - Maryland Correctional Enterprises Diversity Report
Del Crutchfield, et al

Criminal Law – Sexual Crimes – Repeal of Spousal Defense (Love Is No Defense to Sexual Crimes)
Del Atterbeary

Family Law - Grounds for Divorce
Del Atterbeary

Peace Orders - Workplace Violence
Del Moon

Criminal Law - Marijuana - Possession and Possession With Intent to Distribute

Other
Anne Arundel
Created: 1/25/2021 11:05 AM
8:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube

Baltimore City
Created: 1/22/2021 2:09 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Local Bill Hearings

Baltimore County
Created: 1/27/2021 7:27 AM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing: Senator Chris Van Hollen
Bill Hearings: HB181, HB249, HB555
(Added - 1/28/2021 12:17 PM)
Bill Hearings: HB181, HB249
(Removed - 1/28/2021 12:17 PM)

Charles
Created: 1/20/2021 3:19 PM
10:15 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Charles County House and Senate Delegations Organizational Meeting

Eastern Shore
Created: 1/14/2021 10:48 AM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
General discussion of events and legislation pertinent to the Eastern Shore Delegation.

Frederick
Created: 1/22/2021 2:00 PM
9:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Update from Senator Chris Van Hollen

Montgomery
Created: 1/23/2021 12:54 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
Discussion of legislation and other business relevant to Montgomery County.

No. 11 - Baltimore City
Created: 1/15/2021 11:00 AM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Baltimore City Senate Delegation with Baltimore City Stakeholders

Southern Maryland
Created: 1/25/2021 3:27 PM
9:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Delegation Meeting

Click to return on the top page